CHAIN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required