Accounts and annual returns KICKSTART GHANA

Charity number: 1139399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 November 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 January 2019 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required