OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: MAYFIELD

Charity number: 1138867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.88k £7.08k £3.98k £5.45k £2.96k
Total expenditure £2.24k £5.22k £3.59k £9.77k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A