TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 12 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 12 December 2016 On time Download