TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Grayling Trustee 23 August 2019
TOUCHSTONE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT Received: 37 days late
LINDA MAUGHAN Trustee 05 July 2013 None on record
Graham Wright Trustee 29 August 2019 None on record
Elisha Ann Lycett Trustee 06 July 2020 None on record
Faizan Naeem Sayed Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
George Lewis Reeves Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Alan Lofthouse Chair 01 July 2019 None on record
CLARE CAROLINE ANGELL POWNE Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record