THREE SPIRES FAMILY SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1137825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time Download