UNIVERSITY OF EXETER STUDENTS' GUILD

Charity number: 1136468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 July 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 22 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download