Financial history Horizons Education Trust

Charity number: 1136362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.14m £998.06k £839.33k £20.00k £0
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.53m £1.14m £256.88k £73.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.14m £998.02k £839.33k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £482 £36 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £319.79k £524.83k £462.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £44.27k £261.53k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £1.08m £1.01m £679.28k N/A N/A