THE NATIONAL PRO BONO CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NPBC is designed to be a legal hub for pro bono charities in the sector and supports the wide range of pro bono projects and brokerage, helping individuals and community groups all over England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
- 08 July 2013: Funds received from 1097790 PROBONOUK.NET LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Jackson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HENRY GLANVILLE BOURNS | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN LESLIE BASS | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN THOMAS CROWNE | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL ANN PIERCE CARTY | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GUY GIBSON BERINGER KC Hon | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|||||
SIR ROBIN KNOWLES CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361.83k | £326.83k | £150.85k | £142.78k | £244.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £382.88k | £314.10k | £87.87k | £122.18k | £207.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ADOPTED 8 SEPTEMBER 2010 AND ENTERED ON COMPANIES REGISTER 16 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE UPHOLDING AND PROPER ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE PROVISION OF PRO BONO LEGAL SERVICES; (II) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF LAWYERS UNDERTAKING OR INTENDING TO UNDERTAKE SUCH SERVICES; OR (IV) THE SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT AND ADVICE TO LAWYERS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES OR THE UNDERTAKING OF VOLUNTARY WORK IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW, EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES, COMMUNITY WORK AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES OR FACILITIES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF PREMISES, DIRECTED TOWARDS IMPROVING THE ADMINISTRATION OF THOSE CHARITIES OR OTHERWISE MAKING THEM MORE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE SO AS TO ENHANCE THE SERVICE PROVIDED TO BENEFICIARIES OF THOSE CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Pro Bono Centre
IDRC
1 Paternoster Lane
LONDON
EC4M 7BQ
- Phone:
- 02070923942
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window