DARFUR VICTIMS ORGANISATION FOR REHABILITATION AND RELIEF

Charity number: 1139011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 July 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required