ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF HOLLINGWORTH LAKE

Charity number: 1136889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2020 31 March 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2019 28 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2018 31 March 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2016 Not Required