INSTITUTE FOR STRATEGIC DIALOGUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AN INDEPENDENT THINK TANK WORKING WITH LEADERS IN GOVERNMENT, BUSINESS, MEDIA AND ACADEMIA TO DEVELOP MULTI-COUNTRY RESPONSES TO THE MAJOR SECURITY AND SOCIO-ECONOMIC CHALLENGES OF OUR TIME AND TO ENHANCE EUROPE'S CAPACITY TO ACT EFFECTIVELY IN THE GLOBAL ARENA. ACTIVITIES INCLUDE RESEARCH, SPECIALISED TASK FORCES, HIGH LEVEL POLICY BRIEFINGS AND CROSS BORDER NETWORKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income:
£6,014,739
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.01m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,802,997
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.80m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £163,135 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.80m |
People
51 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- United States
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir MICHAEL DAVIS | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Konstantin von Unger | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Zinser | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Williams | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Serra Kirdar | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK BERGMAN | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEWIS | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Stuart Fiertz | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63m | £4.61m | £5.65m | £6.83m | £6.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08m | £5.01m | £5.19m | £6.93m | £6.80m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £47.50k | N/A | £163.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.63m | £4.61m | £5.56m | £6.83m | £6.01m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.37k | £79 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £2.12k | £90.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.08m | £5.01m | £5.19m | £6.93m | £6.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.72k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £628.48k | £0 | £425.74k | £1.05m | £825.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £52.74k | £140.70k | £89.58k | £67.80k | £43.26k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £21.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.95m | £1.54m | £2.17m | £2.18m | £1.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £294.29k | £392.28k | £487.50k | £574.23k | £565.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/2008 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/03/2011
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT, ECONOMICS, POLITICS, LAW, ADMINISTRATION AND SOCIAL SCIENCES; 2) THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; C) COMMISSIONING AND/OR CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; AND D) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; 3) THE PROMOTION OF NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WITH A VIEW TO MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES DIVIDED BY ETHNICITY, RELIGION, POLITICS AND BACKGROUND BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) INVESTIGATING AND IDENTIFYING PROBABLE CAUSES OF CONFLICT WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING THE OCCURRENCE OF CONFLICT; B) COMMISSIONING AND/OR CARRYING OUT RESEARCH TO IDENTIFY POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS TO ISSUES OF CONFLICT; C) MEDIATING WITH PARTIES TO THE CONFLICT AND OTHERS TOGETHER TO DISCUSS POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS ENABLING THEM TO BUILD TRUST; AND D) RECOMMENDING TO THE PUBLIC AND PARTIES INVOLVED, MEASURES WHICH ARE LIKELY TO RESULT IN THE RESOLUTION OR PREVENTION OF A POTENTIAL OR MANIFEST CONFLICT; AND 4) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 75769
LONDON
SW1P 9ER
- Phone:
- 02074939333
- Email:
- sk@isdglobal.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window