SUJATA BANERJEE DANCE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity include, but are not currently limited to: - Holding dance classes on a twice weekly basis - Presenting innovative dance performances - Holding workshops in schools - The maintenance of a website and pages on social media platforms to promote the organisation - Organising master classes and tours promoting eminent South Asian dance and music practitioners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £26,928 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
- SUJATA BANERJEE DANCE COMPANY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Soumitra Chakravorty | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heldiney Pereira | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rajib Banerjee | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Mehul Nathwani | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|||||
BHAVISHA MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.58k | £115.33k | £114.80k | £121.28k | £145.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.20k | £98.04k | £102.38k | £151.97k | £135.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £23.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.49k | £1.12k | N/A | N/A | £26.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) YOUNG PEOPLE, IN SOUTH ASIAN AND OTHER FORMS OF DANCE AND MUSIC ACTIVITIES AND TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE GREATER INVOLVEMENT IN AND ACCESS TO THE SAME.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 STAG CLOSE
EDGWARE
HA8 5LQ
- Phone:
- 02089057199
- Email:
- admin@sbdc-kathak.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window