THE AZAD CHOUDHURY EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1137053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 August 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required