1ST WESTON VILLAGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1137590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required