1ST WESTON VILLAGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1137590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.87k £27.74k £27.45k £37.46k £29.70k
Total expenditure £14.24k £25.99k £29.88k £37.02k £27.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A