THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON

Charity number: 1136970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 June 2017 On time Download