THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON

Charity number: 1136970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Roy Armstrong Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Angela Mary Briggs Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
SARAH MARGARET NEISH Trustee None on record
Rev Gordon Charles Randall Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record
Colin Alfred Ronald Aiken Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
ROBIN LINCOLN KEMP Trustee 28 April 2019
SOTERIA TRUST Received: On time
ALTON CHRISTIAN CARE LIMITED Received: On time
LISA LORRAINE HILLAN Trustee 13 June 2017
ABF CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Keith Arrowsmith-Oliver Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
DEREK ALLAN GURNEY Trustee 26 April 2015
RESURRECTION TRADING Received: On time
NEW FOREST KEEPERS WIDOWS FUND Received: On time
Rev Rachel Caroline Sturt Trustee 21 May 2017 None on record
Rev Lynn Diane Power Trustee 25 September 2016 None on record
Debbie Parker Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
VICTORIA ESTELLE HEWITT Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Elspeth Mary Mackeggie Gurney Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
John Richard Vivian Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Rev ANDREW MARK MICKLEFIELD Chair 22 May 2014
THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
THE KINGS ARMS (PETERSFIELD) Received: 2 days late
WINCHESTER SOCIAL ENTERPRISE
Timothy Charles Duddridge Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Matthew David Bayliss Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Wendy Jean Burnhams Trustee 26 May 2016 None on record
JENNIFER LAWRENCE Trustee 12 August 2011 None on record