SUTTON IN THE ELMS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision for Christian worship. A number of activities for members and the community. Community activities include: baby group, toddler group, family events, a wellbeing cafe, community cafe, summer holiday club and regular involvement in annual community events and with local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Previously excepted registration
- Sutton Elms Baptist Church (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Peter Morley | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elizabeth Sawyer | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Hill | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Clissold | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Wheway | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert William FOSTER | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Susan Harris | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVIES | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.99k | £68.58k | £269.03k | £158.30k | £167.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.55k | £70.51k | £296.84k | £115.39k | £120.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £8.12k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SUTTON LANE
SUTTON IN THE ELMS
BROUGHTON ASTLEY
LEICESTER
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE9 6QF
- Phone:
- 01455283874
- Email:
- secretary@suttonelms.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window