Trustees UNIVERSITY OF LINCOLN STUDENTS UNION
Charity number: 1138187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zuzanna Romanska | Chair | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hafiza Maira Munir | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Ricky Parkin | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Marie Clarke | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Janet Elsie Dempsey | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie White | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Carey | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Robson | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roseline Edide Archibong | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ellen Corn | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Eke | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Liburd | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.