Financial history ON COURSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £542.53k £653.34k £480.56k £748.19k £425.42k
Total expenditure £424.32k £532.65k £463.88k £681.59k £470.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £504.14k £637.24k N/A £676.32k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £100 £120 N/A £1.42k N/A
Income - Other £38.28k £15.99k N/A £70.45k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £414.51k £434.82k N/A £667.68k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.80k £97.83k N/A £13.91k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.89k £4.26k N/A £4.20k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A