Trustees THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST ANDREW'S PSALTER LANE CHURCH, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1137529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Naomi Cooke Trustee 01 September 2022
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Alastair Richard Morris Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Julie Jordan Brown Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Sarah Lesley Hindmarsh Trustee 03 April 2022
ESCAFELD CHORALE
Received: On time
Anna Louise Calvert Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Jennifer Mary Carpenter Trustee 27 April 2021
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Dr Peter Lawrence Mitchell Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Kweku Ackom-Mensah Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Clare Loughridge BSc Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Joseph William Dey Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Alison Jane Gregg Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Katrin Anne Hackett Trustee 19 April 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
BANNER CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NETHER GREEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rachel Amy Morris MA Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
William Atherton Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
Dr JOHN CANNING CRIPPS PH.D Trustee 26 July 2012
SHEFFIELD AREA GEOLOGY TRUST
Received: On time
Professor John Howard Harding Trustee
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN BOOLER Trustee
None on record
JUDITH MARGARET ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
Dr CAROLINE JEAN CRIPPS BSC,PHD Trustee
None on record
JANET ISOBEL LOUGHRIDGE BA, MCLIP Trustee
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Hollows Trustee
None on record
JUDITH MARY KENWARD Trustee
None on record