THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS LUTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable as many people as possible to worship at our church and to become part of our parish community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Luton
Governance
- 17 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST FRANCIS PCC LUTON (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Josias de Souza | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Holland | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Andrew Brown | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Daniel Sudeep Midde | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Archer | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
PHILIP RICHARD LINE | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Clifford Hosker | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Patricia Beaumont | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Cooper | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Borritt | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ann Cleaver | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKY WILSON | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
WINIFRED JOAN KINNINMONTH | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOAN MCINTOSH | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DAVID HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY MARTIN MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.11k | £94.98k | £80.21k | £86.04k | £100.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.70k | £91.48k | £98.09k | £100.67k | £97.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carteret Road
LUTON
LU2 9JZ
- Phone:
- 01582 451132
- Email:
- office@stfrancisluton.org.uk
- Website:
-
stfrancisluton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window