Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SELLY OAK

Charity number: 1137205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £171.36k £224.08k £231.94k £125.20k £110.20k
Total expenditure £231.21k £136.68k £144.05k £115.22k £100.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.80k £6.40k N/A N/A N/A