SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to provide practical and emotional support to any person who has left/or wants to leave an abusive relationship including LGBT. We help them gain confidence and self-worth to move on with their lives,we also provide information on relevant local agencies that they may need. We also provide support for men and women survivors of any kind of domestic or sexual abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 06 April 2011: Standard registration
- 08 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- (S.O.D.A) (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.11k | £33.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.55k | £33.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | 24 April 2014 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | 24 April 2014 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ABUSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window