Accounts and annual returns CODE 7 LTD

Charity number: 1138411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window