Financial history CODE 7 LTD

Charity number: 1138411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £80.64k £89.21k £116.80k £96.33k £210.54k
Total expenditure £83.60k £95.67k £118.91k £96.05k £182.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £19.15k £28.67k £36.17k