Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF COBER VALLEY HELSTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1136551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.22k £11.59k £6.05k £9.40k £9.00k
Total expenditure £12.76k £12.88k £6.54k £7.86k £7.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A