CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST PHILIP (WORCESTER PARK)

Charity number: 1137612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £276.81k £220.18k £200.49k £295.18k £184.83k
Total expenditure £251.03k £199.23k £190.25k £215.48k £184.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A