CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST PHILIP (WORCESTER PARK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Church with St Philip provides a centre for Christian worship in the local community which is open to all. The premises support a wide range of youth and adult activities for both the congregation and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwenda Carpenter | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Heather Gill Cordery | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Wicks | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Cook | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Iris Slater | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Yaskey | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Faye Le Mestre | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Oliveira | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dassie | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Bicknell | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CARPENTER | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ELIZABETH CHARLTON | Trustee | 13 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND PAUL DOUGLAS TIMMIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.18k | £184.83k | £122.64k | £157.30k | £186.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.48k | £184.60k | £157.32k | £184.41k | £191.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches. In achieving its purpose, the Charity will engage in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including (but not restricted to): a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; and f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church with St. Philip
Ruskin Drive
Worcester Park
Surrey
KT4 8LG
- Phone:
- 02083307630
- Email:
- xcsp_halls@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window