WORLD HEART BEAT MUSIC ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1139579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 28 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 28 April 2016 On time Download