WORLD HEART BEAT MUSIC ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1139579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £285.11k £242.54k £443.97k £578.35k £720.10k
Total expenditure £268.64k £296.85k £293.72k £499.84k £581.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £5.81k £86.28k £96.55k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £452.59k £578.62k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £124.65k £139.81k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.09k £1.67k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £25 £4
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £333.94k £330.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £20.39k £69.62k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.62k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £164.25k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £145.52k £181.64k