ALL PEOPLE ALL PLACES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide accommodation, care and advocacy for the homeless. We work with partner agencies to deliver a robust pathway into accommodation, sustain tenancies and break the cycle of homelessness. We aim to replicate our model wherever there is a need and enthusiasm. Working with partners we are also looking at the development of properties to become part of our pathway and maximise impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£683,652
Donations and legacies | £291.61k | |
Charitable activities | £389.05k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £3.00k |
Total expenditure:
£309,869
Raising funds | £27.70k | |
Charitable activities | £282.17k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £389,045 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £282.17k | |
Retained for future use | £373.78k |
People

5 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 2011: Standard registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Rodney Wakefield | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosa Sulley | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Graham | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Michelle Ackerman | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex John Michael | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lawton | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER LIVERMORE | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.63k | £716.35k | £199.42k | £281.26k | £683.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £284.88k | £561.94k | £338.28k | £240.46k | £309.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £425.39k | £31.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £319.72k | N/A | N/A | £128.67k | £389.05k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £290.96k | N/A | N/A | £291.61k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £425.39k | N/A | N/A | £389.05k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £561.94k | N/A | N/A | £282.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £27.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £18.73k | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £5.76k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £270.06k | N/A | N/A | £544.86k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £6.04k | N/A | N/A | £10.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 DECEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 12 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, PARTICULARLY THE HOMELESS AND THOSE SLEEPING ROUGH, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE".
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ghost Mail
5 Brayford Square
LONDON
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 07840345872
- Email:
- info@allpeopleallplaces.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window