Accounts and annual returns SALE WEST COMMUNITY URBAN TRUST

Charity number: 1137438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window