Financial history WORLD SHIP SOCIETY LTD.

Charity number: 1139902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £92.22k £176.28k £85.89k £67.77k £65.70k
Total expenditure £73.01k £95.05k £82.25k £69.39k £66.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A