ZERO GRAVITY KNOW NO LIMITS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR GYMNASTICS AND OTHER SPORTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 11 August 2010: Standard registration
- FRAS (Working name)
- FALCON RIDGE ACADEMY OF SPORT FOR CORNWALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Elaine Balding | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Averil Rose Pinckney | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.43k | £221.36k | £178.15k | £203.08k | £209.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.15k | £200.35k | £180.36k | £213.13k | £203.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.58k | £59.51k | £387 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
1 TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR GYMNASTICS AND OTHER SPORTS 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ABOUT HEALTHY LIVING 3 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Zero Gravity
1-3 Castle Buildings
Gilston Road
SALTASH
PL12 6TW
- Phone:
- 01752842517
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window