Financial history NICHOLAS BERWIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1137294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £12 £8 £8 £0 £0
Total expenditure £174.23k £167.75k £190.21k £176.73k £105.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A