Accounts and annual returns MUSIC BEYOND MAINSTREAM LTD

Charity number: 1141227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window