THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY

Charity number: 1138266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all; the provision of sacred space for personal prayer; teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups; pastoral work, including visiting the sick, bereaved and those in need; taking religious assemblies in schools; promoting the mission of the church by engaging with the local community; providing activities for special groups (e.g. young children).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARISH OF PUTNEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN WHITTAKER Chair 01 September 2018
MILES TRUST FOR THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
PEST HOUSES FUND
Received: On time
PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Dr Michelle Penn Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Joshua Yelland Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Oliver Todd Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Rev Helena Whittaker Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Dr Neil Vass Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Karen Todd Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Eve Bradshaw Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Linda O'Riordan Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
GRAHAM JOHN ARTHUR SHAW Trustee 19 May 2022
THE NORA AND OLIVE BREWER MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Margaret Jane Andrews Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Alison Fleming Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Charles Roberts Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Thomas Hugh McEwen Willoughby Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Sarah Louise Thomas Trustee 19 May 2022
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Simpson Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
ROSEMARY LOUISE TAYLOR-DAVIES Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Alexander David Christopher Lowe Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Rev Daniel Mark Trott Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Jane Turner Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Catherine Susan Elizabeth Collyer Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Mark Leadley Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Andrew Grocott Trustee 25 April 2016
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
Richard John Holman FCA Trustee
NIND'S WANDSWORTH CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARTIN LUTHER KING MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORA AND OLIVE BREWER MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAULINE MEETINGS
Received: 44 days late
Putney United Gospel Society
Received: On time
ST NAZAIRE RAID MEMORIAL TRUST
Recently registered
THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE COMMON GOOD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £609.05k £570.70k £570.89k £612.46k £645.23k
Total expenditure £613.25k £573.15k £601.61k £672.49k £627.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £402.44k £402.68k £383.52k £415.97k £450.38k
Income - Other trading activities £46.75k £31.46k £56.68k £32.92k £34.17k
Income - Charitable activities £77.07k £49.15k £55.21k £87.20k £82.16k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £67.09k £72.17k £63.96k £70.51k £73.76k
Income - Other £15.71k £15.25k £11.52k £5.87k £4.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £64.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £606.17k £556.08k £589.60k £662.48k £614.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.09k £17.08k £12.01k £10.01k £13.63k
Expenditure - Governance £6.67k £6.58k £7.08k £5.06k £5.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £49.88k £32.31k £44.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £6.52k £17.08k £11.34k £10.01k £11.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £366.54k £362.99k £367.44k £363.99k £376.66k
Long-term investments £1.38m £1.42m £1.45m £1.40m £1.40m
Other assets £438.83k £408.25k £383.20k £324.98k £342.69k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £42.41k £23.75k £34.44k £33.38k £47.40k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Church
Putney High Street
LONDON
SW15 1SN
Phone:
02087884414