THE SIDNEY STRINGER ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1139831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 August 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 July 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 18 May 2017 On time Download