THE SIDNEY STRINGER ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1139831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.00k £5.00k £76 £207 £3.15k
Total expenditure £12.00k £4.00k £855 £900 £926
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A