Accounts and annual returns JALALABAD JAMAY MASJID

Charity number: 1141065
Charity reporting is overdue by 593 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2021 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 July 2021 251 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 July 2021 617 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 July 2021 617 days late Download Open in new window