BRASSINGTON RECREATION GROUND CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1138255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 November 2020 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 April 2018 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1785 days