Financial history UK TOREMET LIMITED

Charity number: 1140972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £727.10k £4.39m £3.14m £7.32m £5.21m
Total expenditure £736.02k £4.34m £3.11m £7.13m £5.10m
Income from government contracts £37.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £37.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £710.09k £4.37m £3.11m £7.24m £5.21m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £16.47k £17.70k £34.46k £75.02k £3.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £133 £9 £69 £87 £423
Income - Other £405 £2.88k £426 £279 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £730.48k £4.34m £3.06m £7.08m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.40k £922 £43.66k £39.64k £981
Expenditure - Governance £2.40k £0 £13.20k £0 £7.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £710.09k £0 £0 £0 £4.91m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.13k £0 £4.92k £13.35k £892