DERBYSHIRE SPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1142299
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £73.13k £59.12k £3.04k £5.46k £50
Total expenditure £43.98k £123.20k £9.36k £6.50k £6.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A