Accounts and annual returns THE HERON THEATRE

Charity number: 501134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 05 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window