NEWCASTLE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1138091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 28 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Annual return 29 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download