NEWCASTLE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1138091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nadia Sara Ahmed Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
David Donald Miller Trustee 01 February 2019 None on record
Ella Mary Nicole Williams Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Benthe Tanghe Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Ropafadzo Dorothy Chirwa Chair 26 June 2020 None on record
Hannah Finney Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Timothy David Rodaway Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
BENJAMIN JOHN SADLER Trustee 12 July 2013 None on record
Sarah Winship Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Sohail Ahmed Shaikh Trustee 01 February 2019 None on record
Charlotte Boulton Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Jonathan Alan Bennett Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
Elias Al Dahan Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
Sian Dickie Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record