HANDSOFFPHONE

Charity number: 1138120
Charity reporting is overdue by 970 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 March 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required