EBENEZER WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity number: 1141152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.06k £32.95k £31.93k £25.13k £17.86k
Total expenditure £35.05k £28.26k £26.95k £20.37k £19.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A